judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00310-CV
07-89-00310-CV
09/28/1989
Contract
Lowe, William J.
City State Bank in Wellington, Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/1992Mandate Issued
12/17/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
08/30/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/29/1991Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
08/16/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/09/1991Response to any order, inquiry or motion
07/17/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
11/06/1990Motion to Supplement the Record Disposed
11/06/1990Submitted
11/06/1990Submission
11/05/1990Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
11/05/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
10/10/1990Submission
12/21/1989Do not use
11/30/1989Do not use
11/16/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
10/30/1989Brief Filed
09/28/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
100th District Court
Collingsworth
Honorable David W. Hajek
5793