judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00901-CV
05-89-00901-CV
07/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Courtney, Ralph
City of Sherman, Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1997Record RetentionRetain
04/26/1991Mandate Issued
04/26/1991Mandate Issued
04/22/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Motion or Writ Denied
10/17/1990Record RetentionRetain
06/18/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/10/1990Response to Motion
05/09/1990Response to Motion
05/01/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/30/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
04/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
01/31/1990MattConv
11/15/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/14/1989Brief Filed
10/25/1989Letter Filed
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Brief Filed
09/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1989Response to Motion
08/18/1989MattConv
08/17/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/11/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/10/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Transcript Filed
08/07/1989Response to Motion
07/31/1989Motion for Leave to File
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/06/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/21/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
15th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable James Ray Fry
88-1535