judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00712-CR
14-89-00712-CR
07/31/1989
Auto Theft
Brown, Curtis Edward
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/1991Case stored
06/12/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
05/15/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
03/04/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/25/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/08/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
01/24/1991Opinion issuedREVERSED AND RENDERED
01/24/1991Opinion issuedREVERSED AND RENDERED
12/04/1990Submitted
12/04/1990Submission
12/04/1990Submitted
11/06/1990Submission
10/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/15/1990Case ready to be set
10/15/1990Case ready to be set
09/17/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/23/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/26/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/17/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/28/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/20/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/17/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
03/29/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/23/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
02/01/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/26/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/24/1990No description available.
11/30/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/22/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/16/1989Transcript FILED
08/28/1989Motion for new trial FILED
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Date of Sentence
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTony Aninao
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER
524,277
30 years TDC