judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00715-CV
14-89-00715-CV
07/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Icenhower, Jerry L.
Ian M. Segal Pension Plan and Berlio, N.V.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/12/1990Case stored
02/08/1990Mandate Issued
02/08/1990Mandate Issued
01/02/1990No description available.
11/30/1989Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
11/30/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAMOOT
11/13/1989Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
11/13/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
10/12/1989Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/12/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/29/1989Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
09/14/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEDENIED
09/14/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/13/1989Motion to retain FILED - ANT
09/13/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989Submitted
09/06/1989Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
08/31/1989Motion for extension of time to file bondDENIED
08/28/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
08/25/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Extend time to fild bond FILED - ANT,APE
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. G. Morris Hamm
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeFritz Barnett
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable RICHARD MILLARD
84-04834