judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00701-CV
14-89-00701-CV
07/31/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Diaz, Juan E. and Isabel Ind. and as Reps for Diaz, Gisela I
Smith, Bradley Judge of 125th Judicial District, Harris
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/15/1989Case stored
08/10/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
08/03/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
07/31/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
07/31/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJohn D. Ellis, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorDavid W. Showalter
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorRobert J. Binstock
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 125th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentGail N. Friend
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES BRADLEY SMITH
85-31642