judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8902
C-8902
07/31/1989
App Writ of Error
SITTERLE PROPERTIES
TEXAS SAVINGS & LOAN ASSOCIATION ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/15/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentOF TX. S&L & SHIRLEY TORRILLON
08/08/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF STONE OAK
07/31/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/20/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
11/06/1989Motion to strike disposedOverruledPET'S MO/STRIKE RESPONSE OF STONE OAK TO APPLICATION
08/22/1989Motion to Strike filedMOTION TO STRIKE RESPONSE OF STONE OAK, INC.
08/15/1989Reply to ResponseOF TX. S&L & SHIRLEY TORRILLON
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/08/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF STONE OAK
07/31/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/30/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STONE OAKRespondentMr. R. Laurence Macon
TORRILLON, SHIRLEYRespondentMs. Winifred H. Dominguez
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00658-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 05-17-89
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable ALFONSO CHAPA
Trial Court Information
225th District Court
Bexar
Honorable John Cornyn
88-CI-21036