judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PIPPIN VS. SIERRA HEALTHCARE

Case Information: 34920
Short Caption:PIPPIN VS. SIERRA HEALTHCARECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34581
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401973Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/08/1999 / Apfelberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Benson, Bertoldo & Baker--check no. 23532.
10/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09521
10/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert S. Apfelberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/06/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (MISSING) 99-12167
01/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing statement; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-00623
01/28/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01421
03/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-03863
03/21/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-04476
05/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 15 days. 00-08839
06/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 11, 2000. 00-10110
07/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The settlement judge assigned to these matters, now deceased, filed a report in Docket No. 34920 indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of that appeal. The settlement judge, however, did not file a report in Docket No. 34581. Nevertheless, it appears that the parties were also unable to agree to a settlement in Docket No. 34581. Appellants: 15 days to file a docketing statement in Docket No. 34581. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these consolidated appeals. Pending completion of our jurisdictional review and further order of this court, we suspend the briefing schedule previously established in Docket No. 34920 and the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended in Docket No. 34581. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant in Docket No. 34581). Nos. 34581, 34920. Document No. 00-11957.
10/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 12, 2000, this court entered an order which directed appellants to file a docketing statement in Docket No. 34581 by July 27, 2000. fn1[That order also consolidated the appeals in Docket Nos. 34581 and 34920 and suspended the briefing schedules in these appeals pending completion of jurisdictional reviews.] To date, appellants have failed to file the docketing statement. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement in Docket No. 34581 or show cause why that appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant in Docket No. 34581.) Nos. 34581, 34920. Document No. 00-18525.
01/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 34581. On July 12, 2000, this court entered an order consolidating these appeals and directing appellant to file a docketing statement in Docket No. 34581 by July 27, 2000. To date, appellants have failed to comply with our October 19, 2000, order or otherwise communicate with this court. We hereby dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 34581 as abandoned. Nos. 34581, 34920 (these cases are no longer consolidated.) 01-00172
02/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. fn11[SHO shall have 10 calendar days from the date upon which the Pippins serve their response to this order to file and serve a reply. A reply is not mandatory, but permissive.] 02-02929
04/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellants have not responded to this court's February 14, 2002 order to show cause. "We hereby dismiss this appeal." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-06328
05/07/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06531
05/07/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2002. 02-06531