judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GERRY LEWIS ROSENDAHL v. JANELLE A. ROSENDAHL

Case Heading (S-11-0046)
Case Number:S-11-0046Case Docketed On:02/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:GERRY LEWIS ROSENDAHL v. JANELLE A. ROSENDAHL
Full Title:GERRY LEWIS ROSENDAHL, Appellant (Defendant), v. JANELLE A. ROSENDAHL, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGerry Lewis RosendahlMichael William Stulken
AppelleeJanelle A. RosendahlEric Frederick Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2011 WY 162
Citation:267 P.3d 557

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/07/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/08/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/11/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal. Filed transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/20/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/6/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal