judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00198-CR
02-89-00198-CR
07/31/1989
Felony DWI
Rasberry, Robert Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1991Mandate Issued
02/26/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/22/1991Submitted
01/22/1991Submission
11/19/1990Letter Brief Filed
11/08/1990Letter
10/11/1990Brief Filed
09/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/14/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/18/1990Brief Filed
07/18/1990Submission
06/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/14/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/14/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/12/1990No Description Available.
01/24/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1990No Description Available.
11/22/1989No Description Available.
11/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/20/1989Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyItem is Moot
11/15/1989No Description Available.
10/26/1989Order EnteredAbated
10/19/1989Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
09/22/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/22/1989Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
08/28/1989No Description Available.
07/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Rasberry, Robert RayCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Harry Hopkins
0321901D
2 yrs., TDC + $1,500. Fine