judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00777-CV
01-89-00777-CV
07/31/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Upton, John H., et al
Baylor College of Medicine, et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/18/1992Mandate issued
02/21/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
02/19/1992Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/04/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/09/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
10/03/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
09/16/1991Writ filed
08/16/1991Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
07/17/1991Date final opinion release for publication
07/17/1991Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
07/10/1991Motion to file writ
06/13/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/30/1991Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
04/24/1991Motion for rehearing filed
04/11/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/23/1990Submitted
10/23/1990Submission
10/23/1990Submitted
10/19/1990Supplemental brief filed
09/12/1990Submission
05/09/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/09/1990Case ready to be set
05/09/1990Case ready to be set
04/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/26/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/15/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/23/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/29/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/02/1990Statement of facts filed
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispMotion will be taken with case
12/04/1989Order enteredGrant motion
11/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/17/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/10/1989Filing fee paid
08/02/1989Transcript filed
07/31/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/18/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantGrant Kaiser
StateAppelleeHon. Dan Ryan
StateAppellantBob Ballard
StateAppelleeDenton E. Ragland, Jr.
StateAppelleeCharles D. Boston
Trial Court Information
127th District Court
Harris
81-36541