judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00189-CV
12-89-00189-CV
07/31/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Choice, John
Hawley, Eunice, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
11/06/1989
11/01/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989
10/02/1989
09/15/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/15/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1989No Description Available.Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
09/15/1989Submission
09/15/1989Submitted
08/30/1989Letter from the Court
08/29/1989Case ready to be set
08/29/1989Brief Filed
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/08/1989Brief Filed
07/31/1989No Description Available.
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
89-309-A