judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00914-CV
05-89-00914-CV
07/31/1989
Contract
Wittenberg, Stephen
Texas Commerce Bank-Northwest, N. A.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/27/2000Record RetentionDestroy
09/05/1990Mandate Issued
09/05/1990Mandate Issued
07/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Submission
05/24/1990Brief Filed
05/24/1990Submitted
05/24/1990Submission
05/24/1990Submitted
05/17/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/15/1990Motion for Postponement
04/26/1990MattConv
03/23/1990Submission
03/14/1990Motion for Postponement
03/14/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990MattConv
12/29/1989Brief Filed
12/29/1989Case ready to be set
12/29/1989Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Letter Filed
12/13/1989Response to Motion
12/06/1989Letter Sent by the Court
12/04/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
11/20/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/31/1989Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Response to Motion
10/05/1989Brief Filed
10/05/1989Motion to Supplement Record
09/05/1989Brief Filed
08/31/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/1989MattConv
08/25/1989Response to Motion
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
08/10/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/09/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/31/1989Transcript Filed
07/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/16/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/06/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark L. Whittington
87-6529-H