judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6560
B-6560
02/15/1977
Application for Writ of Error
G. E. LEHMANN AND GORDON H. MONROE
RYAN MORTGAGE INVESTORS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/23/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/01/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1977Response to Motion filed
06/23/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/01/1977Response to Petition
03/08/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/28/1977Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
02/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/15/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ryan Mortgage InvestorsRespondent
G. E. Lehmann and Gordon H. MonroePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information