judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDON MARK BABIONE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0114)
Case Number:S-09-0114Case Docketed On:06/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRANDON MARK BABIONE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRANDON MARK BABIONE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandon Mark BabioneDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/14/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal and original waiver of appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/18/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal