judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOROTHY PERKINS V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Information: 11-AA-0059
Short Caption:DOROTHY PERKINS V. D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02849-10Filed Date:01/24/2011

Opening Event Date:01/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDorothy PerkinsYPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/24/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
01/24/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by DCCA)
02/04/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to January 24, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
05/09/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
05/10/2011TMC - motion for stay
05/11/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED as the motion does not address any of the factors required for a stay...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that petitioner is requesting that the court summarily reverse the order on appeal, THAT REQUEST IS DENIED... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the OAH shall file the record w/n 30 days... (RZTHPR)
05/11/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY (emergency)
05/13/2011On consideration of petitioner's motion for stay, construed as a motion for reconsdieration, it is O that petitioner's motion is denied for teh reasons stated in or order dated may 11, 2011, denying her intial motionfor stay. MORE SEE ORDER (RZTH)
07/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/12/29/10 hearing
07/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/09/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
09/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 10/29/11
09/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
10/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
10/27/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
11/30/2011FiledOrder directing motion and appendix
12/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
12/16/2011FiledChange Of Address noted in C track. Order remailed. Appendix due date recalculated (Petitioner)
01/05/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Dorothy Perkins (Petitioner)
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix. (Petitioner)Granted
01/31/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix. (Petitioner)
01/31/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
03/01/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
03/05/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
08/28/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
08/28/2012FiledAffirmed
09/19/2012FiledMandate