judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. SMITH (BRIAN)

Case Information: 38335
Short Caption:STATE VS. SMITH (BRIAN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO007659Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14030
08/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: (no dates given). Court Reporter: Christian Knox. Filed in district court on: August 15, 2001. 01-14108
08/22/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal/Fast Track. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is a Fast Track appeal. Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.
08/24/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/18/01, 5/29/01, 5/30/01. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 01-14388
08/31/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14759
08/31/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-14760
10/04/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16712
10/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 4, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track response received on October 4, 2001. 01-16820
10/08/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16713
10/09/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/30/01. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 01-16985
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the State's contention is without merit, and we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn3[Although this court has elected to file the fast track statement, appendix and response submitted, it is noted that none of these documents complies with the arrangement and form requirements of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Counsel for appellant and respondent are cautioned that failure to comply with the requirements for documents in the future may result in the documents being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared and may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20918
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00229
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2002. 02-00229