judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENRY R. SANCHEZ, a/k/a RICKY SANCHEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0113)
Parent:S-09-0113Case Docketed On:06/16/2009
Consolidated: S-10-0044
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:HENRY R. SANCHEZ, a/k/a RICKY SANCHEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HENRY R. SANCHEZ, a/k/a RICKY SANCHEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHenry R. SanchezTimothy Charles Kingston
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 77
Citation:253 P.3d 136

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/19/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
07/24/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2009Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
09/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/11/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/29/2009Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
10/13/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order Setting Hearing (Motion for New Trial)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
11/18/2009Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk re motion for new trial. Still under advisement.EventPhone CallFinal
11/23/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Decision letter denying motion for new trial. District Judge directed Prosecutor to draft an order.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesDecision letterFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - other (denial of motion for new trial with attached order).Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's status reportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Event - Other - Mr. Morgan has advised the Court that he will be filing a Notice of Appeal after the District Court's Order denying motion for new trialEventOtherFinal
01/22/2010Event - Phone Call from Public Defender re docketing of second NOA. Will call District Court ClerkEventPhone CallFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Second NOA docketed)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/12/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
04/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to consolidate appealsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Timothy C. Kingston for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/21/2010Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for remand for hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel or for permission to file supplemental brief with regard to ineffective assistance of counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2010Event - Other -Stayed case pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 21(d)EventOtherFinal
05/24/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Motion - Other - File Brief of AppelleeMotionOtherFinal
05/25/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for permission to file opening brief and for permission to file supplemental brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opposition to appellant's motion for remand for hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel or for permission to file supplemental brief with regard to ineffective assistance of counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2010Order - Denying Motion for Remand, Order Granting Permission to File Supplemental Brief, Order Granting Public Defender's Motion to Withdraw, and Order Setting Briefing SettingOrderDenyFinal
07/06/2010Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
07/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's supplemental briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volumes V-VI, Transcripts; Volume VII, Confidential Folder; Volume VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tim Kingston for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2010Order - Other - Emergency Order allowing four justices to hear oral argument. Justice Voigt not attending.OrderOtherFinal
10/19/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Timothy Kingston for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/05/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/26/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/24/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal