judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARLENE C. JACKSON V. HOWARD UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 11-CV-0138
Short Caption:DARLENE C. JACKSON V. HOWARD UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7223-10Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarlene C. JacksonNPro SeN
AppelleeHoward UniversityN
Marshall W. TaylorYN
Leroy T. Jenkins NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/15/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 4, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/18/2011RECORD INDEX
02/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/09/2011APPEARANCE - of Marshall W. Taylor on behalf of aple
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/04/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
05/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY- to aple's motion for summary affirmance AND motion for oral argument for affirmation relief
05/17/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - replyS
05/24/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY - to aplt' reply to aple's motion for summary affirmance and motion for oral arguement for affirmative relief
08/03/2011FiledLetter From aplt re: case on appeal (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledAppellee's Response to Appellant's Notice. (Appellee)
09/29/2011FiledOrder Denying APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT, SS, FILING APPELLANT'S SURREPLY, DENYING the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and DIRECTING APPELLEE'S BRIEF
09/29/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S SURREPLY - to Appellee's Reply . . . to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance and Motion for Oral Argument for Affirmative Relief
11/02/2011FiledOrder directing appellee to submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
11/17/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief (Appellee)
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/26/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/05/2012FiledAppearance by Leroy Jenkins (Appellee)
09/05/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee)Granted
09/05/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's emgency motion to contiune the oral argument scheduled for september 6, 2012 (Appellant)
09/06/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Washington, McLeese, Belson
09/06/2012VacatedOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument
09/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/24/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte vacating 9/6/12 order and submitting.
01/23/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, McLeese, Associate Judge, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
02/05/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
02/05/2013FiledMotion to publish memorandum opinion and judgment entered 1/23/13 pursuant to D.C. app rule 36 (c) (Appellant)Denied
02/26/2013FiledOrder Denying aplt's pro se motion to publish.
03/22/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
04/01/2013FiledMandate