judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EARL J. HULL v. ISADORE AVNET

Case: A-4635
A-4635
04/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
EARL J. HULL
ISADORE AVNET
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/28/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/29/1954Motion for Leave to file Motion for RehearingRefused
06/10/1954Response to Motion filed
06/02/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/28/1954Response to Petition
04/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Earl J. HullPetitioner
Isadore AvnetRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information