judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6576
B-6576
02/18/1977
Application for Writ of Error
RUTH PARKER
HIGHLAND PARK, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/1978Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/21/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/13/1977Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/02/1977Post submission brief filedRespondent
05/23/1977Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/20/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/18/1977Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
05/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1977Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/22/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/14/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
02/18/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/06/1978Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/27/1978Response to Motion filed
02/21/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/08/1978Concurring Opinion issued.
02/08/1978Opinion issued
09/27/1977Miscellaneous letter
06/13/1977Response to Brief filed
06/02/1977Post submission brief filed
05/25/1977Response to Motion filed
05/23/1977Brief on the Merits
05/20/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1977Brief on the Merits
05/18/1977Miscellaneous Motion
05/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/29/1977Reply to Response
03/22/1977Reply to Response
03/14/1977Response to Petition
02/18/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/18/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tarrant County Trial Lawyers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Ruth ParkerPetitioner
Highland Park, Inc.Respondent
Richard L. Griffith, S. G. Johndroe, III, and Sloan B. BlairAmicus Curiae
Wayne FisherAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information