judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-01150-CR
05-82-01150-CR
01/01/1982
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Wayne Gary Taylor
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/19/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
01/22/2004Return to storage
01/07/2004Pulled from storage
07/01/1997Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/21/1997Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/15/1997Motion to Withdraw Record
05/20/1996Motion to Withdraw Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/28/1984Mandate Issued
10/26/1984Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
04/19/1984Petition for discretionary review filed
04/11/1984Petition for discretionary review filed
04/11/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
04/11/1984MattConv
03/16/1984Letter issued by the court
02/21/1984Response to Motion
02/16/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/13/1984Motion for rehearing filed
01/27/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/03/1984Submitted
11/30/1983MattConv
11/18/1983Brief Filed
09/28/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/29/1983Brief Filed
07/21/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/29/1983Clerks record filed
06/29/1983Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
03/09/1983Motion for extension of time to file record filed
03/09/1983Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1983Motion for extension of time to file record filed
02/09/1983Motion for extension of time to file record filed
02/09/1983Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/11/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
01/01/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1994Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 204th District Court
F81-6988-NQ
5 yrs TDC