judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00025-CR
14-82-00025-CR
01/04/1982
Robbery
Bellinger, Jonathan aka Daniel Jackson
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/1983No description available.
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
11/01/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/04/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/09/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/04/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
341,763
Life