judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-82-00001-CV
10-82-00001-CV
01/04/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Madisonville Independent School District, et al.
Judy Gail Kyle, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/20/1983Case stored
07/20/1983Mandate issued by this Court
10/07/1982Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
08/05/1982Submitted
01/04/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Madison
4154