judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01354-CR
05-81-01354-CR
12/31/1981
Rape of a Child
Steven A. King
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/26/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/12/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/01/1982Letter received
09/17/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/18/1982Letter issued by the court
06/30/1982Letter issued by the court
06/28/1982Letter received
06/25/1982Letter issued by the court
06/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/21/1982Letter received
05/19/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/26/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/09/1982Letter received
03/16/1982Reporters record filed
03/16/1982Clerks record filed
12/31/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/17/1982Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
King, Steven A.Criminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
F-80-9342-MS
10 yrs. TDC