judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01360-CR
05-81-01360-CR
12/31/1981
Driving While Intoxicated
Wornise McGary
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/12/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
01/19/1984Order enteredRefused
12/28/1983Order enteredRefused
09/26/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
09/16/1983Letter issued by the court
07/28/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/13/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/08/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/15/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/19/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/18/1982Letter issued by the court
07/11/1982Supplemental clerks record filed
07/07/1982Reporters record filed
05/11/1982Clerks record filed
04/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
02/18/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
12/31/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/28/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 10
Dallas
Honorable Dallas County Judge, County Criminal Court No. 10
81-04668
10 days, $250 Fine & Court Costs