judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DR. JACK KAHN v. ALBERT B. ALKEK

Case: A-4663
A-4663
04/28/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DR. JACK KAHN
ALBERT B. ALKEK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/07/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/27/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/17/1954Amended PetitionPetitioner
05/15/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/10/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/28/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/07/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/27/1954Response to Brief filed
05/17/1954Amended Petition
05/15/1954Reply to Response
05/10/1954Response to Petition
04/28/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/28/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Albert B. AlkekRespondent
Dr. Jack KahnPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information