judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VALERIO VS. VALERIO

Case Information: 38305
Short Caption:VALERIO VS. VALERIOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D263390Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from The Law Firm of Geraldine Kirk-Hughes, Inc.--check no. 9862.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13714
08/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-14044
09/10/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-15213
09/10/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We deny appellant's August 16, 2001 request for transcripts.] SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17123
11/02/2001Other Other. Returned, unfiled with letter, transcripts dated April 23, 2001, March 19, 2001, February 5, 2001 and May 23, 2001 to court reporter Deborah Casper.
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 01-17332
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17332
04/04/2002Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated March 28, 2002 with related documents.