judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERAMIE JOHN EDWIN LARGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0068)
Case Number:S-11-0068Case Docketed On:03/24/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JERAMIE JOHN EDWIN LARGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JERAMIE JOHN EDWIN LARGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeramie John Edwin LargeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Speedy Trial
Opinion Number:2011 WY 159
Citation:265 P.3d 243

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/24/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stewart M. Young for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Stewart Michael Young, Director, PAP, for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/30/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/16/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/21/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal