judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4631
A-4631
04/13/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT WENDELL HAINSWORTH
HARRIS COUNTY COMMISSIONERS' COURT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitionerOVERRULED - Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Robert Wendell Hainsworth
04/13/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerApplication for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Robert Wendell Hainsworth
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/27/1954Response Waiver filedResponse Waiver filed on behalf of Harris County Commissioners Court, et al.
05/24/1954Motion for RehearingOVERRULED - Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Robert Wendell Hainsworth
05/12/1954Opinion issuedRefusedThe Court refused the application for writ of error. Per Curiam Opinion
04/20/1954Response Waiver filedResponse Waiver filed on behalf of Harris County Commissioners' Court
04/13/1954Case Record Filed Record filed from the First Court of Appeals
04/13/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledApplication for Writ of Error filed on behalf of Robert Wendell Hainsworth
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hainsworth, Robert WendellPetitioner
Harris County Commissioners' CourtRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information