judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HICKS VS. HICKS

Case Information: 38338
Short Caption:HICKS VS. HICKSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D256405Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/06/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Firm of Geraldine Kirk-Hughes, Inc.--check no. 9896.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14032
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-16121
10/03/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 11, 2001 and July 18, 2001. To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 01-16660
10/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Joann Hicks hereby substitutes Bruce I. Shapiro as attorney of record in the place and stead of Israel L. Kunin. 01-16664
10/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
10/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Substitution of Attorneys. 01-16973
10/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-17528
10/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
12/21/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 11, 2001 and July 18, 2001. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-21592
03/26/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-05366
04/10/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 30. 02-06370
07/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 02-12947
08/12/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-13797
08/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 12, 2002. Appellant shall have until September 3, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-13888
09/06/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 09/03/02. 02-15385
09/06/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-15386
10/07/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 6, 2002. 02-17287
12/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondent has failed to file the answering brief. Respondent shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. We caution respondent that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. See NRAP 31(c). Appellant may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 30 days from service of the answering brief. 02-20646
12/06/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 35 pages. 02-20937
12/06/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: December 4, 2002. 02-20938
12/06/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-20939
01/16/2003Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
05/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-07596
05/06/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/18/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-10184
07/15/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-10383
07/15/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/31/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2003. 03-10383