judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN A. DeLOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0117)
Case Number:S-09-0117Case Docketed On:06/22/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:STEVEN A. DeLOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN A. DeLOGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven A. DeLoge Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Other, Property
Opinion Number:2010 WY 60
Citation:231 P.3d 862

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Docketing delayed pending receipt of docket fee)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/22/2009Correspondence - Outgoing from Clerk of CourtCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
07/14/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/14/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/12/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/12/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/14/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/14/2009Event - Phone Call from Cheyenne Police Department regarding a request for the return of property from Mr. DeLoge. Referred caller to the District Attorney's office.EventPhone CallFinal
11/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief (Reply) Appellant inadvertently dated pleading December 30 instead of November 30, date of cover letter.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/02/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/02/2009Order - Denying Motion for Extension to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/15/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/23/2009Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re record exhibits. Court Reporter does not have Exhibits 1 - 4. Will contact DA's office on Monday.EventPhone CallFinal
12/29/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/02/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/02/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2010Petition - Rehearing with brief in support. Accepted as timely filed pursuant to Rule 14, prisoner delivery rule. Mandate has issued.PetitionRehearingFinal
06/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/4/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/22/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
06/22/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of CertiorariNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Writ of Certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal