judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOVAN D. JAMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0061
Short Caption:JOVAN D. JAMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL599-97Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJovan D. James YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/07/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER since appellant has no constitutional right to counsel to pursue post-conviction relief... (BY: ETW) LW
02/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's). ***motion included in response
03/08/2011 On further consideration of this court's February 7, 2011, which directed appelalnt to show cause...and the response thereto, wherein appellant request that the appeal be dismissed, it is ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and this appeal is hereby dismissed. (BY: ETW) LW
03/08/2011DISMISSED
03/30/2011MANDATE ISSUED