Case Information: 38339 | |||
Short Caption: | BRYANT VS. CANNON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39931 , 42789 , 47909 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D211327 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/17/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Emily Stevens Services--check no. 2434. | ||
08/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-14033 | |
10/01/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to appear in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents submitted by appellant, and deny the relief requested therein. We also direct the clerk of this court to return to respondent the opposition to appellant's proper person motion, and deny any relief requested in the opposition as moot in light of this order.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-16460 | |
10/01/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to attorney Matthew L. Johnson with the law firm of Hutchison & Steffen. Returned unfiled, the original Opposition to Plaintiff/Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Case Dismissed for Premature Filing, and for Immediate Stay of Judgment for Attorney's Fees, and Related Relief; and Counter-Motion by Respondent to Dismiss Appeal, received on September 10, 2001. | ||
11/07/2001 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Opposition to Plaintiff/Appellant's Motion to Reinstate and/or Reconsider Appeal Dismissed for Premature Filing on an Order Shorting Time, for Permission to Proceed in Proper Person, to set Aside the Recent District Court's Order until such time as the appeal is heard, for Attorney Fees, or in the Alternative and an Extension of Time to Either Amend the District Court's Order, and to Waive Costs to Enable a New Appeal. | ||
11/09/2001 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff/Appellant's Motion to Reinstate and/or Reconsider Appeal Dismissed for Premature Filing on an Order Shorting Time, for Permission to Proceed in Proper Person, to set Aside the Recent District Court's Order until such time as the appeal is heard, for Attorney Fees, or in the Alternative and an Extension of Time to Either Amend the District Court's Order, and to Waive Costs to Enable a New Appeal. (Opposition was returned, unfiled on 11/7/01). | ||
12/17/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave under NRAP 46(b) to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant, and deny the relief requested therein as moot in light of this order.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-21238 | |
01/02/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-00026 | |
01/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. | 02-00026 |