judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY WILLIAM DODS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0118)
Case Number:S-09-0118Case Docketed On:06/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:TIMOTHY WILLIAM DODS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY WILLIAM DODS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy William DodsR. Michael Vang
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2010 WY 133
Citation:240 P.3d 1208

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/19/2009Event - Rejected Filing - counsel filed brief of appellant, however, after review it was discovered that required redactions had not been made, and some appendices were improper. Counsel requested it be removed and he will resubmit revised brief.EventRejected FilingFinal
08/20/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2009Record - Returned unfiled record - transcript of motion hearing of 10/28/08 to counsel for appellant for filing in district court.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
09/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/26/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/27/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Confidential Folder; and CD's.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/06/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/22/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/22/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/25/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal