judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PARRIS BENJAMIN CHISHOLM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0062
Short Caption:PARRIS BENJAMIN CHISHOLM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-22854-09Filed Date:01/19/2011

Opening Event Date:01/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/15/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cory Lee Carlyle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cory Lee Carlyle, Esquire
02/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (16-pgs/coney 3/22/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (136-pgs/coney 3/23/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (147-pgs/coney 3/24/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (63-pgs/coney 3/25/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (42-pgs/coney 3/26/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (126-pgs/shelton 10/28/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 (6-pgs/janifer 11/4/10 proc.)
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (259-pgs/coney 11/1-2,5/10proc.) w/cd
06/15/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/17/2011RECORD COPIES
06/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
08/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/01/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/07/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/02/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
12/15/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION and...
12/15/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance. (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed
01/06/2012FiledMandate
01/13/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)