judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9748
A-9748
07/25/1963
Application for Writ of Error
SHEFFIELD DIVISION, ARMCO STEEL CORPORATION, SHEFFIELD DIVISION AND ROBERT MCWHIRTER
MRS. WALTER O. JONES, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1964Response to Reply filedPetitioner
04/01/1964Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/12/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/26/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/08/1963Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/01/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
07/25/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/25/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1964Response to Reply filed
04/01/1964Reply to Response
03/18/1964Response to Motion filed
03/12/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/26/1964Opinion issued
11/26/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/26/1963Motion for leave to file brief
10/16/1963Document received (See Remarks)
10/16/1963Document received (See Remarks)
08/08/1963Response to Petition
08/01/1963Response to Petition
07/25/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/25/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/25/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sheffield Division and Robert McWhirterPetitioner
Sheffield Division, Armco Steel CorporationPetitioner
Mrs. Walter O. Jones, Jr., et al.Respondent
Newton Gresham and Sam W. CruseAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information