judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9768
A-9768
08/02/1963
Application for Writ of Error
FELIX A. DAVIS
ALWAC INTERNATIONAL, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/17/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1963Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/20/1963Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/18/1963Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/14/1963Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/06/1963Response to Reply filedRespondent
10/07/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/20/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/02/1963Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/02/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/22/1964Response to Motion filed
01/17/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/27/1963Response to Motion filed
11/23/1963Motion to Strike filed
11/22/1963Reply to Response
11/20/1963Response to Brief filed
11/18/1963Brief on the Merits
11/14/1963Response to Brief filed
11/06/1963Response to Reply filed
10/07/1963Reply to Response
09/20/1963Response to Petition
08/02/1963Brief in Support of Petition
08/02/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/02/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alwac International, Inc., et al.Respondent
Felix A. DavisPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information