judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6489
B-6489
01/11/1977
Application for Writ of Error
ARCHER PARR
BONNIE M. WHITE, ADMINISTRATRIX, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/15/1977Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/30/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/03/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/26/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/11/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/15/1977Brief in Support of Petition
06/30/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1977Reply to Response
04/26/1977Response to Petition
03/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
01/11/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/11/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Archer ParrPetitioner
Bonnie M. White, Administratrix, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information