judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAROLYN F. WILLIAMS V. MEL WOOD HORTICULTURAL

Case Information: 11-AA-0021
Short Caption:CAROLYN F. WILLIAMS V. MEL WOOD HORTICULTURALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02940-10Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCarolyn F. Williams YPro SeN
RespondentMel Wood HorticulturalNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW -NUNC PRO TUNC
01/13/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
01/28/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT to JANUARY 13, 2011. It is *****MORE*****
01/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING and how she is AGGRIEVED by the 1/10/11 ORDER which granted petitioner the relief sought... (BY: ETW)
01/28/2011TMC - OTSC
02/25/2011 ORDERED that this PFR is hereby DISMISSED for lack of standing since petitioner is not aggrieved by the administrative order on appeal... (FIKGST) (rm)
02/25/2011DISMISSED
03/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED