judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASTRO (MIGUEL) VS. EDUCATION DEPT., ELY STATE PRISON

Case Information: 38301
Short Caption:CASTRO (MIGUEL) VS. EDUCATION DEPT., ELY STATE PRISONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0008014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13683
09/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court directs the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 01-16250
10/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Compliance with Court's Order dated 9-26-01. 01-18162
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Documents. The attorney general shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court certified copies of any available prison notice of appeal log for July 23, 2001 and July 26, 2001. If the notice of appeal log does not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, or if the Ely State Prison does not maintain the required notice of appeal log, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 01-19284
12/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Compliance with Court's Order Dated 11/19/01. 01-21404
01/23/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-01580
02/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02023
02/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2002. 02-02023