judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JORDAN VS. SPERO

Case Information: 38302
Short Caption:JORDAN VS. SPEROCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38756
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100946AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due. (08/16/01--received minute order from Carson City Clerk granting appellant in forma pauperis status.)
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13702
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/16/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Carson City Clerk enclosing a copy of 8/14/01 minute order granting appellant Jordan in forma pauperis status. 01-13990
08/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to appear in proper person, we have nevertheless considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We deny the relief requested therein as moot in light of this order.] On August 16, 2001, we received from the Carson City Clerk a minute order dated August 14, 2001, granting appellant's application for in forma pauperis status. The appeal is moot. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14691
09/25/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14781
09/25/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 27, 2001. 01-14781