judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAD I. MULDOON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0065)
Case Number:S-11-0065Case Docketed On:03/22/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHAD I. MULDOON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHAD I. MULDOON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChad I. MuldoonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/22/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/12/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
05/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal