judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD WYNN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0022
Short Caption:RONALD WYNN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-20026-08Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/11/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/18/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
David B. GoodhandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David H. Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David H. Reiter, Esquire
02/15/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/Allison) 3/23/09 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (100 pgs/McCarn) 2/23/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (92 pgs/McCarn) 2/24/10 proc.
05/10/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (424 pgs/Davis) 3/15-16/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (425-736 pgs/Davis) 3/17-18 & 22/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (737-785 pgs/Davis) 3/23-25/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (4 pgs/Graybill) 3/24/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (30 pgs/Graybill) 3/26/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (24 pgs/Gilliam) 3/29/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (19 pgs/McCarn) 8/23/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (28 pgs/McCarn) 8/25/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (97 pgs/McCarn) 8/26/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (171 pgs/McCarn) 8/27/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (226 pgs/McCarn) 8/30/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (241 pgs/McCarn) 8/31/10 proc. w/cd
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (230 pgs/McCarn) 9/1/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (13 pgs/Maddox) 9/2/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (191 pgs/McCarn) 9/2/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (36 pgs/Hunt) 9/3/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (128 pgs/McCarn) 9/7/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (16 pgs/Maddox) 9/8/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #22 (39 pgs/Maddox) 9/9/10 proc.
05/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #23 (31 pgs/Davis) 12/10/10 proc. w/cd
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #24 (SEALED orders)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (18 pgs/Ott) 3/1/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #26 (8 pgs/Ott) 3/3/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #27 (23 pgs/Ott) 3/8/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #28 (216 pgs/Ott) 3/9/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #29 (121 pgs/Ott) 3/10/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #30 (147 pgs/Ott) 3/11/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #31 (118 pgs/Ott) 3/12/10 proc. w/cd
07/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
01/26/2012FiledBriefing Order
02/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 4/6/12.
04/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/11/12
06/11/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/11/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/06/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Oberly, Ferren David H. Reiter, Esq. for appellant David B. Goodhand, Esq. for appellee
11/21/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part (OPINION) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge)
11/25/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/18/2013FiledMandate