judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00041-CR
05-82-00041-CR
01/08/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Dortha Lee Baldridge Carty
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/06/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/09/1987Letter received
12/08/1987Letter issued by the court
10/17/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
09/26/1983Notice filed
05/31/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
05/20/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
05/20/1983Letter issued by the court
04/07/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/07/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/06/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/13/1982Clerks record filed
04/13/1982Reporters record filed
02/12/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
01/08/1982Docketing statement filed
01/08/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baldridge Carty, Dortha LeeCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 204th District Court
F81-1584-PQ
30 years TDC