judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00006-CV
01-82-00006-CV
01/08/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Rich, Kenneth O., Sr.
Rich, Kenneth O., Jr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1984No description available.
05/21/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/09/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
08/11/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/20/1983Motion for rehearing filed
04/07/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/17/1983Submitted
02/10/1983Submission
01/13/1983Motion to dismiss appeal
04/15/1982Submission
04/06/1982Brief filed
03/12/1982Brief filed
01/25/1982Statement of facts filed
01/08/1982Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Harris
l45,629