judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-82-00010-CV
02-82-00010-CV
01/11/1982
Divorce
Trickey, Katherine
Trickey, Richard
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/24/1983Mandate Issued
03/09/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/02/1983Writ DisposedDismissed
01/03/1983Writ Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
325th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
325-10560