judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00889-CR
14-89-00889-CR
09/26/1989
Robbery
Gray, Ernest Lee
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/1991Extend time to file PDR FILED
10/23/1990Case stored
10/11/1990Mandate Issued
10/11/1990Mandate Issued
09/24/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/07/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/22/1990Submitted
08/22/1990Submission
08/22/1990Submitted
04/16/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/16/1990Case ready to be set
04/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/19/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/18/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/21/1989No description available.
11/20/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/17/1989Transcript FILED
09/28/1989Motion for new trial FILED
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1989Date of Sentence
09/20/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCheryl E. Irvin
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
510,079
40 years TDC