judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT F. LITTLEJOHN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0042
Short Caption:ROBERT F. LITTLEJOHN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-10646-10Filed Date:01/12/2011

Opening Event Date:01/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert F. Littlejohn Y
Ian A. WilliamsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ian Williams, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ian Williams, Esquire
02/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 28, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/16/2011RECEIVED - aplt's motion to stay execution
02/18/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Feb. 16 motion for stay of execution received from appellant. (JC)
03/04/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
03/04/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
03/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (14 pgs/tape) 8/9/10 proc.
04/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18 pgs/tape) 1/7/11 proc. w/cd
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
05/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 14, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
06/01/2011 error
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 40 days (unopposed)
06/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 31, 2011. (Castillo)
07/28/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw Under Anders (Appellant)Granted
11/04/2011FiledORDERED THAT APPELLANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE (ANDERS) NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 30, 2011
11/04/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
12/30/2011FiledORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
12/30/2011FiledAffirmed
01/25/2012FiledMandate