judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILSON (ALLAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38316
Short Caption:WILSON (ALLAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991749Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13830
08/30/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14762
08/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 29, and 30, 2001. Court Reporter: D. Davidson and S. Moore (TRF does not contain name of district court judge). 01-14763
09/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 1, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 01-15097
09/12/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15382
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 29, 2001 and May 30, 2001. Court Reporter: Susan O'Hara Moore. 01-15526
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On August 30, 2001, attorney Cheryl D. Bond filed a notice of appearance on behalf of appellant. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-16068
01/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 21, 2002. 02-01728
02/25/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-03476
02/25/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/30/01 and 01/07/02. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 02-03477
03/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 25, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by March 25, 2002. 02-03836
03/25/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/22/02. Signed by: Cheryl D. Bond. 02-05215
03/25/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-05216
04/25/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 6, 2002. 02-07326
05/07/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/06/02. Signed by: Joseph R. Plater. 02-07990
06/03/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 05/31/02. 02-09624
09/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-15855
09/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
12/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA 02-21149
01/07/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00029
01/07/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 13, 2003. 03-00029