judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: BRYAN DUTCHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0093)
Case Number:S-09-0093Case Docketed On:05/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: BRYAN DUTCHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: BRYAN DUTCHER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryan DutcherKenneth Bert DeCock
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 10
Citation:223 P.3d 559 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/17/2009Affidavit - Affidavit of costs and expensesAffidavitAffidavit of costs and expensesFinal
06/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Brief, Appellant's Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/31/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/19/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/04/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/05/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/05/2010Affidavit - Attorney fees and costsAffidavitAttorney fees and costsFinal
02/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees & ExpensesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal